EP0284229 - Nonlinear optical material and method for orientation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Seizo 3-18-26 Houya Houya-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshinaga, Kazuo 4-21-19 Haramachida Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Miyazaki, Takeshi 4-363-16 Tsukagoshi Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301909.3 | 04.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | JP19870051786 | 06.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5178687 | JP19870054439 | 09.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5443987 | JP19880018812 | 29.01.1988 Original published format: JP 1881288 | JP19880021497 | 01.02.1988 Original published format: JP 2149788 | [1988/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0284229 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284229 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/35, G02B1/04 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
G02F1/3615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/39] | Title | German: | Nichtlineares optisches Material und Verfahren zu dessen Orientierung | [1988/39] | English: | Nonlinear optical material and method for orientation thereof | [1988/39] | French: | Matériau optique non linéaire et méthode pour l'orienter | [1988/39] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 20.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0186999 [ ] (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]); | EP0214828 [ ] (CELANESE CORP [US]); | EP0218938 [ ] (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | EP0232138 [ ] (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) |