EP0285275 - Audio pre-processing methods and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [1988/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quatieri, Thomas F., Jr. 993 Massaschusetts Avenue Arlington Massachusetts 02174 / US | 02 /
McAulay, Robert J. 4 Lexington Avenue Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US | [1988/40] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302062.0 | 10.03.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | US19870034204 | 02.04.1987 Original published format: US 34204 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285275 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285275 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G10L7/00 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
G10L19/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Vorverarbeitung eines akustischen Signals | [1988/40] | English: | Audio pre-processing methods and apparatus | [1988/40] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de prétraitement d'un signal acoustique | [1988/40] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/01] | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.06.1990 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO8605617 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) | [AD] - ICASSP 86 PROCEEDINGS IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, Tokyo, 7th-11th April 1986, vol. 3, pages 1713-1715IEEE; R.J. McAULAY et al.: "Phase modelling and its application to sinusoidal transform coding" | [A] - ICASSP 85 PROCEEDINGS IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, Tampa, 26th-29th March 1985, vol. 3, pages 945-948IEEE; R.J. McAULAY et al.: "Mid-rate coding based on a sinusoidal representation of speech" | [XP] - ICASSP 87 PROCEEDINGS IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, Dallas, 6th-9th April 1987, vol. 3, pages 1645-1648IEEE; R.J. McAULAY et al.: "Multirate sinusoidal transform coding at rates from 2.4 KBPS to 8 KBPS" |