EP0282291 - Process for producing ultrafine particles of metals, metal compounds and ceramics and apparatus used therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saiki, Goro c/o Daiichi Gijutsu Kenkyusho Nippon Steel Corp. 1618, Ida Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Jiro c/o Daiichi Gijutsu Kenkyusho Nippon Steel Corp. 1618, Ida Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | 03 /
Takeda, Koichi c/o Daiichi Gijutsu Kenkyusho Nippon Steel Corp. 1618, Ida Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | 04 /
Maki, Mutsuo c/o Tobata Puranto Seisakusho Nippon Steel Corp. 46-59, Oaza Nakabaru Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi / JP | 05 /
Ooki, Tutomu c/o Tobata Puranto Seisakusho Nippon Steel Corp. 46-59, Oaza Nakabaru Tobata-ku Kitakyusho-shi / JP | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302066.1 | 10.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | JP19870053985 | 11.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5398587 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0282291 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0282291 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282291 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01J12/02, B01J19/08, B22F9/12, C01B21/06, H05H1/24, // C04B35/00 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/956 (EP,US);
B01J12/002 (EP,US);
B01J12/02 (EP,US);
B01J19/087 (EP,US);
B22F9/12 (EP,US);
C01B13/145 (EP,US);
C01B17/20 (EP,US);
C01B21/06 (EP,US);
C01B21/0724 (EP,US);
C01B32/90 (EP,US);
C01B32/984 (EP,US);
C01B33/02 (EP,US);
C01B33/06 (EP,US);
C01B35/04 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
C01B21/0602 (EP,US);
C01B21/0617 (EP,US);
C01B21/062 (EP,US);
C01B21/064 (EP,US);
C01B21/068 (EP,US);
C01B21/076 (EP,US);
C01P2004/32 (EP,US);
C01P2004/38 (EP,US);
C01P2004/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F9/12, B22F2202/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/37] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren von ultrafeinen Partikeln aus Metall, Metallverbindungen und Keramiken, und dafür zu verwendender Apparat | [1988/37] | English: | Process for producing ultrafine particles of metals, metal compounds and ceramics and apparatus used therefor | [1988/37] | French: | Procédé de préparation de particules extrêmement fines de métaux, de composés de métal et de céramique, et dispositif utilisé | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 22.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1814557 (IONARC SMELTERS LTD N P L); | [A]US3989512 (SAYCE IAN GEORGE); | [A]US4009413 (ELLIOTT WILLIAM G, et al); | [A]US4386258 (AKASHI KAZUO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0199482 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) | [A] - PLASMA CHEMISTRY AND PLASMA PROCESSING, vol. 5, no. 1, March 1985, pages 1-37, Plenum Publishing Corp., Bristol, GB; R.M. YOUNG et al.: "Generation and behavior of fine particles in thermal plasmas-A review" |