EP0282300 - A colored liquid-crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kozaki, Shuichi 51-303, 2-1-2, Ukyo Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Ichimura, Yukiko 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Narutaki, Yozo 1202-298, Gojo-cho Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302087.7 | 10.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | JP19870054397 | 10.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5439787 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282300 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282300 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/137 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
C09K19/3001 (EP,US);
C09K19/46 (EP,US);
G02F1/1397 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/37] | Title | German: | Farbige Flüssigkristall-Anzeigeeinrichtung | [1988/37] | English: | A colored liquid-crystal display device | [1988/37] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides de couleur | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2172422 [ ] (HITACHI LTD); | GB2154016 [ ] (HITACHI LTD); | US4579425 [ ] (ISHII YUTAKA [JP], et al); | EP0260450 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) | [ ] - SID 1985 Digest of Technical Papers, 1st Edition, May 1985, New York T.J. SCHEFFER et al. "24x80 Character LCD Panel using the Supertwisted Birefringence Effect" pages 120-123 * page 120, left column, line 1 page 122, left column, last line * |