EP0283216 - Improved prepolymer compositions for polyurea reaction injection molding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | For all designated states ICI AMERICAS INC. Concord Pike & New Murphy Road Wilmington Delaware 19897 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | ||
For all designated states ICI AMERICAS INC. Concord Pike & New Murphy Road Wilmington Delaware 19897 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillis, Herbert Russell Mechelsesteenweg 146 B-1960 Sterrebeek / BE | 02 /
Cassidy, Eduard Francis rue J. Vanderlinden 28 B-1180 Evere / BE | 03 /
Parfondry, Alain Avenue J. Bordet 66-12 B-1140 Evere / BE | 04 /
Leenslag, Jan Willem Beekstraat 10 B-3055 Neerijse / BE | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Leherte, Georges M.L.M., et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Leherte, Georges Maurice Lucien Marie, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 B-3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 88302137.0 | 11.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | GB19870005801 | 11.03.1987 Original published format: GB 8705801 | [1988/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0283216 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0283216 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0283216 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/50, C08G18/48, C08G18/12, C08G18/10, C08G18/40, C08G18/32 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
C08G18/6685 (EP,US);
C08G18/48 (KR);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/3256 (EP,US);
C08G18/4009 (EP,US);
C08G18/482 (EP,US);
C08G18/5024 (EP,US);
C08G18/503 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/50 (EP,US);
C08G18/10, C08G18/6685 (US,EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3225 (US,EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3253 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/38] | Title | German: | Präpolymer-Zusammensetzungen für das Polyharnstoff-Reaktionsspritzgussverfahren | [1988/38] | English: | Improved prepolymer compositions for polyurea reaction injection molding | [1988/38] | French: | Compositions de prépolymères pour le moulage réactif par injection de polyurées | [1988/38] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 25.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.1993 | BE | 08.09.1993 | CH | 08.09.1993 | LI | 08.09.1993 | [1994/32] |
Former [1994/26] | BE | 08.09.1993 | |
CH | 08.09.1993 | ||
LI | 08.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 08.09.1993 | |
LI | 08.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1358187 (GEN TIRE & RUBBER CO); | [X]US3441588 (WAGNER KUNO, et al); | [X]US3979364 (ROWTON RICHARD LEE); | [X]DE3411216 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]WO8605795 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) |