EP0282345 - Process for improving the flavour of robusta coffee sorts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SARA LEE/DE N.V. P.O. Box 2 3500 CA Utrecht / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states SARA Lee/DE N.V. P.O. Box 2 NL-3500 CA Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states COMPACK Kereskedelmi Csomagolo Vállalat Landler Jeno u. 23 H-1078 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varsányi, Márta Mezò u. 34/b H-1222 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Krajczár, Pál Bajcsy Zs u. 70 H-2233 Ecser / HU | 03 /
Runtág, Tivadar Nagyszalonta u. 55 H-1112 Budapest / HU | 04 /
Dörnyei, József Hevesi Gyula u. 79/c H-1157 Budapest / HU | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1988/37] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302176.8 | 11.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | HU19870001112 | 13.03.1987 Original published format: HU 111287 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0282345 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0282345 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282345 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/16, A23F5/02 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
A23F5/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/37] | A23F5/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verbessern des Aromas von Robusta-Kaffeesorten | [1988/37] | English: | Process for improving the flavour of robusta coffee sorts | [1988/37] | French: | Procédé d'amélioration de l'arôme de café d'espèces Robusta | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 23.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE547640 ; | [X]FR508906 (EMILE FRANCOIS ROUSSEAU [FR]); | [Y]DE576515 (PAULA LENDRICH GEB REIMANN, et al); | [A]US1972184 (ADOLF CLOSMANN EDUARD, et al); | [Y]DE2030376 |