EP0332772 - Process for reclaiming polyethylene terephthalate scrap contaminated with chlorine-containing polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mehra, Vinodkumar 2203 Regal Drive Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US | 02 /
Subramanian, Pallatheri Manackal 110 Cameron Drive Cameron Hills Hockessin Delaware 19707 / US | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302324.4 | 17.03.1988 | [1989/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0332772 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332772 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08J11/06, // (C08L67/02, 23:08) | [1989/38] | CPC: |
C08J11/06 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
Y02W30/62 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wiedergewinnung von mit chlorhaltigen Polymeren verunreinigten Polyäthylenterephthalatabfällen | [1989/38] | English: | Process for reclaiming polyethylene terephthalate scrap contaminated with chlorine-containing polymer | [1989/38] | French: | Procédé de régénération de déchets de polytéréphtalate d'éthylène contaminé par des polymères contenant du chlore | [1989/38] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 24.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0211649 (DU PONT [US]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 2, 10th Janurary 1977, page 27, abstract no. 6245f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & CS A 163 324 (M. HRDY et al.) 15-06-1976 |