EP0283324 - Light-sensitive silver halide color photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | ||
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION No. 26-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 106 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirabayashi, Shigeto c/o Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tsuruta, Mayumi c/o Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Mizukura, Noboru c/o Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302456.4 | 21.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | JP19870066277 | 20.03.1987 Original published format: JP 6627787 | [1988/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0283324 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0283324 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0283324 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/32 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
G03C7/3225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/38] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliches farbphotographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1988/38] | English: | Light-sensitive silver halide color photographic material | [1988/38] | French: | Matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière | [1988/38] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 21.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 15.09.1993 | FR | 15.09.1993 | IT | 15.09.1993 | NL | 15.09.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | DE | 15.09.1993 | |
IT | 15.09.1993 | ||
NL | 15.09.1993 | ||
FR | 04.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | DE | 15.09.1993 | |
NL | 15.09.1993 | ||
FR | 04.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/39] | DE | 15.09.1993 | |
NL | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | DE | 15.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0207794 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [X]EP0183444 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [Y]GB2066811 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [Y]FR2442464 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) | Examination | EP0267491 |