EP0284441 - II-VI Group compound crystal article and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokunaga, Hiroyuki 10-6-402, Nanpeidai Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yonehara, Takao 1309, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302747.6 | 28.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | JP19870071990 | 26.03.1987 Original published format: JP 7199087 | [1988/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0284441 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0284441 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/365, C23C16/24, C30B25/18, C23C16/04, C23C16/22 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
C30B25/02 (EP,US);
C30B25/18 (EP,US);
C30B29/48 (EP,US);
H01L21/0242 (EP,US);
H01L21/02422 (EP,US);
H01L21/02551 (EP,US);
H01L21/02554 (EP,US);
H01L21/02557 (EP,US);
H01L21/0256 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L21/02639 (EP,US);
H01L21/02647 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/39] | H01L21/365, C23C16/04, C23C16/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/39] | Title | German: | Kristallisches Verbundprodukt der II-VI-Gruppe und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1988/39] | English: | II-VI Group compound crystal article and process for producing the same | [1988/39] | French: | Produit cristallin composite du groupe II-VI et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/39] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 03.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 08.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/43] | 25.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/43] | Request for further processing for: | 13.12.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4333792 (SMITH HENRY I); | [X]EP0180751 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0244081 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]GB2132017 (SECR DEFENCE); | [Y]US4443488 (LITTLE ROGER G [US], et al); | [A]FR2413126 (IBM [US]) | [Y] - L. JASTRZEBSKI et al."Growth process of silicon over SiO2 by CVD : Epitaxial lateral overgrowth technique" vol.130, no.7, July 1983 (1046), pages 1571-1580" |