EP0288171 - Automatic rewinding type safety belt retractors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSRD LIMITED Norfolk Street Carlisle Cumbria CA2 5HX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states BSRD LIMITED Norfolk Street Carlisle Cumbria CA2 5HX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Rudolph Weldstrasse D-8063 Odelzhausen / DE | 02 /
Specht, Martin Hirschgarten Allee 25 D-8000 München 18 / DE | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Turner, Alan Reginald c/o Bendix Limited Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | [1988/43] | Application number, filing date | 88302921.7 | 31.03.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | DE19873711537 | 06.04.1987 Original published format: DE 3711537 | [1988/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0288171 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0288171 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/36 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
B60R22/405 (EP,US);
B60R22/34 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/43] | Title | German: | Automatische Sicherheitsgurtaufrollvorrichtung | [1988/43] | English: | Automatic rewinding type safety belt retractors | [1988/43] | French: | Dispositif automatique de rétraction de ceinture de sécurité | [1988/43] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 31.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0077494 (KLIPPAN NV [BE]); | [Y]DE3430048 (ERNST HANS HELLMUT); | [A]WO8204021 (ERNST HANS HELLMUT); | [XP]US4667894 (IZUCHI SHINGO [JP], et al) |