EP0285446 - Apparatus for surface treatment of synthetic organic polymer mouldings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states LAN TECHNICAL SERVICE CO., LTD. 45-11, Yoyogi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, 1-chome, Kasumigaseki Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states LAN TECHNICAL SERVICE CO., LTD. 45-11, Yoyogi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katoh, Koichiroh Industrial Products Research Ins. 1-1-4, Higashi Tukuba City Ibaragi-ken 305 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Yoshiie Lan Technical Service Co., Ltd. 45-11, Yoyogi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shinonaga, Hideo 285-172, Higashi Terayama-cho Chiba City Chiba Pref. / JP | [1988/40] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302960.5 | 31.03.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | JP19870046622 | 31.03.1987 Original published format: JP 4662287 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0285446 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0285446 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285446 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/16, // B29K23:00 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
B29C59/16 (EP);
B29C2035/0827 (EP);
B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29K2995/0041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Oberflächebehandlung von geformten synthetischen organischen Polymeren | [1988/40] | English: | Apparatus for surface treatment of synthetic organic polymer mouldings | [1988/40] | French: | Appareil pour le traitement de surface d'objets moulés en matière polymère synthétique organique | [1988/40] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1095063 ; | [A]FR1092664 ; | [A]FR2110278 |