EP0286349 - Optical fiber cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1988/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinard, Michael Douglas 1455 Shelly Circle Lawrenceville Georgia 30245 / US | 02 /
Panuska, Andrew John 5936 Islandview Drive Buford Georgia 30518 / US | 03 /
Reynolds, Mickey Ray 3958 Landress Way Lawrenceville Georgia 30245 / US | 04 /
Santana, Manuel Roberto 3863 Miller Court Doraville Georgia 30360 / US | 05 /
Webster, George Harry 1660 Manhasset Drive Dunwoody Georgia 30338 / US | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303001.7 | 05.04.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | US19870036954 | 10.04.1987 Original published format: US 36954 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0286349 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0286349 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
G02B6/4426 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/4433 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/443 (US);
G02B6/4432 (EP,US);
G02B6/4434 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/44384 (EP,KR,US);
H01B7/285 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Optisches Kabel | [1988/41] | English: | Optical fiber cable | [1988/41] | French: | Câble optique | [1988/41] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 05.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/27] | 08.02.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.02.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2635917 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]FR2428849 (FILECA [FR]); | [X]FR2497964 (CABLES ELECTRO TELECOMMUNICATI [FR]); | [A]GB2097552 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]EP0074714 (SUN TECH INC [US]); | [A]EP0107433 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [A]US4464013 (SABIA RAFFAELE A [US]); | [A]EP0212169 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |