EP0286389 - Means for adjusting the timing of a valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BRITISH INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE RESEARCH INSTITUTE LIMITED 111-112 Buckingham Avenue Slough Berkshire, SL1 4PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states THE BRITISH INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE RESEARCH INSTITUTE LIMITED 111-112 Buckingham Avenue Slough Berkshire, SL1 4PH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mansfield, Wilfred Percival Deceased / GB | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Greene-Kelly, James Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Greene-Kelly, James Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303079.3 | 06.04.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | GB19870008210 | 07.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8708210 | GB19870016862 | 17.07.1987 Original published format: GB 8716862 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0286389 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0286389 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F01L31/22 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
F01L13/0063 (EP,US);
F01L2001/187 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Regeln der Steuerzeit eines Ventils | [1988/41] | English: | Means for adjusting the timing of a valve | [1988/41] | French: | Dispositif pour régler la distribution d'une soupape | [1988/41] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 26.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 22.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/18] | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR836367 ; | [X]DE2951361 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [X]EP0179990 (ALLIED CORP [US]); | [X]US4643141 (BLEDSOE PHILLIP G [US]) |