EP0286443 - Device for positioning the weft on weaving machines which utilise tucking-in selvedgers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Società Industriale Cremonese Sicrem S.r.l. Via G.B. Pirelli, 48 Pizzighettone / IT | For all designated states FRATELLI MANEA S.R.L. 21, via Cardatori Schio Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states Società Industriale Cremonese Sicrem S.r.l. Via G.B. Pirelli, 48 Pizzighettone / IT | ||
For all designated states FRATELLI MANEA S.R.L. 21, via Cardatori Schio Vicenza / IT | |||
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states SOCIETA' INDUSTRIALE CREMONESE S.P.A. 48, via Pirelli Pizzighettone Cremona / IT | ||
For all designated states FRATELLI MANEA S.R.L. 21, via Cardatori Schio Vicenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bassini, Silvio 9, via Cavour I-26020 San Bassano, Cremona / IT | 02 /
Manea, Giovanni Battista 16, via Paolo Lioly I-36015 Schio, Vicenza / IT | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1991/14] |
Former [1988/41] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303190.8 | 08.04.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | IT19870020062 | 10.04.1987 Original published format: IT 2006287 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0286443 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/48 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
D03D47/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1988/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einstellen des Schussfadens für Webmaschinen mit einer Webkantenbildevorrichtung | [1988/41] | English: | Device for positioning the weft on weaving machines which utilise tucking-in selvedgers | [1988/41] | French: | Dispositif pour positionner le fil de trame sur des machines à tisser utilisant un appareil pour la formation de lisières | [1988/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/19] | 15.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/18] | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3425461 (BERRY RONALD); | [A]FR2141808 (DEWAS RAYMOND); | [A]FR2249984 (NUOVO PIGNONE SPA [IT]); | [X]US4078586 (PORTER ALLAN WILLIAM HENRY, et al) |