EP0287298 - All-terrain amphibian vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siren, Andrew O. 10011 Fairmount Drive, S.E. Calgary Alberta T2J OS6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states Siren, Andrew O. 10011 Fairmount Drive, S.E. Calgary Alberta T2J OS6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/42] | Representative(s) | Frost, Dennis Thomas, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | [1988/42] | Application number, filing date | 88303204.7 | 11.04.1988 | [1988/42] | Priority number, date | GB19870009125 | 15.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8709125 | [1988/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287298 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287298 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287298 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60F3/00 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
B60F3/0007 (EP,US);
B62D53/00 (EP,US);
F16H2009/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1988/42] | Title | German: | Gelände-Amphibienfahrzeug | [1988/42] | English: | All-terrain amphibian vehicle | [1988/42] | French: | Véhicule amphibie tout-terrain | [1988/42] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 31.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE263092 ; | [A]FR364303 (ANGELO DE LUIGI [IT], et al); | [A]US2923268 (FLETCHER WENDELL S, et al); | [A]FR1368678 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [A]US3198161 (ANDREWS THOMAS D H, et al); | [A]DE1961133 (PORSCHE KG); | [A]US3895596 (AMOUR WILLIAM E); | [YD]CA1012069 (SIREN ANDREW O); | [A]EP0003751 (MAGIRUS DEUTZ AG [DE]) |