EP0290169 - Diamineplatinum complexes with phosphonocarboxylate and substituted phosphonocarboxylate ligands as antitumor agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.1992 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION Menlo Park, CN 40 Edison New Jersey 08818 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION Menlo Park, CN 40 Edison New Jersey 08818 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollis, Leslie Steven 33, Guilford Lane Mercerville New Jersey 08619 / US | 02 /
Amundsen, Alan R. 12 Meadowbrook Drive Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | 03 /
Stern, Eric W. 234 Oak Tree Road Mountainside New Jersey 07092 / US | 04 /
Miller, Arthur V., III 9 Cherrytree Circle Howell New Jersey 07731 / US | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303616.2 | 21.04.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | US19870046476 | 04.05.1987 Original published format: US 46476 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0290169 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0290169 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, A61K31/28 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
C07F15/0093 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | Diamin-Platin-Komplexe mit Phosphoncarboxylat oder substituierten Phosphonocarboxylat-Liganden als Antitumoragenzien | [1988/45] | English: | Diamineplatinum complexes with phosphonocarboxylate and substituted phosphonocarboxylate ligands as antitumor agents | [1988/45] | French: | Complexes de diamine platine avec des ligands phosphonocarboxylates ou phosphonocarboxylate substitués comme agents anti-tumeurs | [1988/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 03.06.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.1990 | 04.05.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0155705 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [XP]US4739087 (SPEER ROBERT J [US], et al); | [A]EP0169645 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) |