EP0288299 - Materials and methods for the diagnosis of cystic fibrosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL MEDICAL SCHOOL Norfolk Place London W2 1PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL MEDICAL SCHOOL Norfolk Place London W2 1PG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williamson, Robert Cystic Fibrosis Genetics Res.Gr Dept.of Biochem. St.Mary's Hospital Medical School University of London London W2 1PG / GB | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303645.1 | 22.04.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | GB19870009652 | 23.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8709652 | [1988/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0288299 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
C07K14/4712 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP);
C12Q2600/172 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/43] | Title | German: | Materialien und Verfahren zur Diagnose von Zystisch-Fibrose | [1988/43] | English: | Materials and methods for the diagnosis of cystic fibrosis | [1988/43] | French: | Matières et procédés pour la diagnose de fibrose cystique | [1988/43] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |