EP0289232 - Feedstock dewatering and etherification of crude methanol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harandi, Mohsen Nadimi 12 Catbird Court Lawrenceville New Jersey 08648 / US | 02 /
Owen, Hartley 5 Riverview Terrace Belle Mead New Jersey 08502 / US | 03 /
Smyth, Sean Connon 132-B 6th Street Manhattan Beach Los Angeles, California 90266 / US | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Colmer, Stephen Gary Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 50-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Colmer, Stephen Gary Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 50-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303666.7 | 22.04.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | US19870043729 | 29.04.1987 Original published format: US 43729 | [1988/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289232 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289232 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C41/06, C07C43/04 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
C07C41/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/06, C07C43/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/44] | Title | German: | Entwässerung und Etherifizierung von rohem Speisemethanol | [1988/44] | English: | Feedstock dewatering and etherification of crude methanol | [1988/44] | French: | Déhydratation et éthérification de méthanol brut d'alimentation | [1988/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0206594 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US3979461 (ANCILLOTTI FRANCESCO, et al) |