EP0290198 - Welan gum in cement compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Floyd L. 1092 Park Hill Terrace Escondito California 92025 / US | 02 /
Best, Glen H. 10221 Greyfox Drive San Diego California 92131 / US | 03 /
Lindroth, Thomas A. 10810 Vista Del Sur Spring Valley California 92078 / US | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [1988/45] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr. European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex, CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303835.8 | 28.04.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | US19870047748 | 07.05.1987 Original published format: US 47748 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290198 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290198 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/38, C12P19/04 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
C08B37/0024 (EP);
C04B24/34 (KR);
C04B24/38 (EP,KR);
C04B28/02 (KR);
C12P19/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | Welan-Gummi in Zementzusammensetzungen | [1988/45] | English: | Welan gum in cement compositions | [1988/45] | French: | Compositions de ciment avec gomme de welan | [1988/45] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/02: Teilanmeldung 92201784.3 eingereicht am 28/04/88 | EPB 1993/02: Divisional application 92201784.3 filed on 28/04/88 | EPB 1993/02: Demande divisionnaire 92201784.3 déposée le 28/04/88 | Examination procedure | 04.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 04.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92201784.3 / EP0507419 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1425822 (FOSROC AG); | [A]US4095987 (WALKER THAD O); | [XD]US4342866 (KANG KENNETH S, et al) |