EP0289357 - Apparatus for washing elongated tape with hot water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/44] | Method and apparatus for washing elongated tape with hot water | ||
[1992/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsubata, Noritaka 3820-33, Kichijima Uozu-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88303957.0 | 29.04.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | JP19870109350 | 01.05.1987 Original published format: JP 10935087 | [1988/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289357 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289357 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289357 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D06B3/10 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
D06B15/04 (EP,US);
D06B3/12 (KR);
D06B3/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Waschen von Bändern | [1992/17] | English: | Apparatus for washing elongated tape with hot water | [1992/17] | French: | Appareil de lavage de bandes | [1992/17] |
Former [1988/44] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Waschen von Bändern | ||
Former [1988/44] | Method and apparatus for washing elongated tape with hot water | ||
Former [1988/44] | Procédé et appareil de lavage de bandes | Examination procedure | 16.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT344120B (BENNINGER AG MASCHF [CH]); | [A]DE2358301 (PEROXID CHEMIE GMBH); | [A]DE2527734 (VEPA AG); | [A]CH648364 (BABCOCK TEXTILMASCH); | [A]DE2612264 (MECCANOTESSILE DI FONTANA E LA) |