EP0294044 - Method of printing on plastic substrate using a water-based ink [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiefer, Harry Martin 4016 Pfeiffer Court Midland Michigan / US | 02 /
McClarnon, Keith Shawn 1093 Stanton Road Lake Zurich Illinois / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304273.1 | 11.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | US19870057598 | 02.06.1987 Original published format: US 57598 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0294044 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294044 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/02, B41M1/30 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
C09D11/03 (EP,US);
B41M1/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bedrucken von Kunststoffsubstraten mittels einer Drucktinte auf Wasserbasis | [1988/49] | English: | Method of printing on plastic substrate using a water-based ink | [1988/49] | French: | Procédé d'impression sur substrat en matière plastique à l'aide d'encre aqueuse | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59213777 ; | [A]EP0076905 (BASF FARBEN & FASERN [DE]); | [A]EP0148615 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US4589920 (KANADA EIJI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 82 (C-275)[1805], 11th April 1985; & JP-A-59 213 777 (SANEI KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 03-12-1984, & JP59213777 A 00000000 |