EP0291298 - Measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jacobsen, Joseph Mary 2 Fr. Griffin Avenue Galway / IE | [1988/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 54, Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [1988/46] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304275.6 | 11.05.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | IE19870001239 | 13.05.1987 Original published format: IE 123987 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0291298 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0291298 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A47C31/12, A47C7/46 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
A47C7/46 (EP,US);
A47C31/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Messvorrichtung | [1988/46] | English: | Measuring apparatus | [1988/46] | French: | Dispositif de mesure | [1988/46] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 11.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2756809 (ERNST ENDRESEN); | [X]US3112137 (DRENTH JOHN B); | [A]DE2064419 ; | [A]EP0141652 (CAMPBELL COLM) |