EP0292212 - Method of and apparatus for processing color image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadowaki, Toshihiro 13-4, Kakinokidai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohnishi, Tetsuya 767-19, Nase-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kato, Koichi 2-15,Minami Maioka 2-chome Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Yasumichi 32-8 Haramachi 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Honma, Toshio 3006-27 Nogawa, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304381.2 | 13.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | JP19870119305 | 15.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11930587 | JP19870119306 | 15.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11930687 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0292212 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0292212 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292212 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/01, H04N1/46 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
H04N1/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Farbbilderverarbeitung | [1988/47] | English: | Method of and apparatus for processing color image | [1988/47] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la manipulation d'une image en couleur | [1988/47] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/31: Teilanmeldung 94203501.5 eingereicht am 13/05/88 | EPB 1995/31: Divisional application 94203501.5 filed on 13/05/88 | EPB 1995/31: Demande divisionnaire 94203501.5 déposée le 13/05/88 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 22.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.1993 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94203501.5 / EP0644686 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0145801 (HELL RUDOLF DR ING GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0168818 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]US4639771 (HATTORI YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) |