Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0580898B | 10.11.1993 | B2 | JPS63288134 | 25.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12141487 | 20.05.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63288135 | 25.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12141587 | 20.05.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63288136 | 25.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12141687 | 20.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0292216 | Global Dossier | 03.11.1993 | B1 | EP0292216 | 23.11.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP12141487 | 20.05.1987 | JP12141587 | 20.05.1987 | JP12141687 | 20.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3885341T | 24.02.1994 | T2 | DE3885341D1 | 09.12.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP12141487 | 20.05.1987 | JP12141587 | 20.05.1987 | JP12141687 | 20.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4991954 | 12.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12141487 | 20.05.1987 | JP12141587 | 20.05.1987 | JP12141687 | 20.05.1987 |