EP0292216 - Ophthalmic disease detection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOWA CO. LTD. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states KOWA CO. LTD. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 460 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Kouichi - c/o Kowa Company Ltd. 1-17-11, Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo, 191 / JP | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Miller, Joseph, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | [1988/47] | Application number, filing date | 88304394.5 | 16.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | JP19870121414 | 20.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12141487 | JP19870121415 | 20.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12141587 | JP19870121416 | 20.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12141687 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0292216 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292216 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/10 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
A61B3/1225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/47] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Diagnostik von Augenleiden | [1988/47] | English: | Ophthalmic disease detection apparatus | [1988/47] | French: | Dispositif de détection de maladies oculaires | [1988/47] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 20.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0167877 (BILLE JOSEF); | [YP]FR2599615 (GARRAUD LOIC PIERRE [FR]); | [YPD]EP0225072 (KOWA CO [JP]); | [AP]EP0234869 (KOWA CO [JP]); | [A]DE2714748 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]DE3041178 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, Munich, 19th-22nd October 1982, page 1226, part 1, proc. 6, IEEE, New York, US; J. BILLE et al.: "Laser scanning ophthalmoscope with active focus control" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 71, no. 4, April 1981, pages 499-501, Optical Society of America, New York, US; R. ZEIMER et al.: "Noninvasive measurement of optic nerve-head compliance by laser doppler velocimetry" |