EP0293137 - Electronic key-operable lock and key therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YALE SECURITY PRODUCTS LIMITED Wood street Willenhall West Midlands, WV13 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states YALE SECURITY PRODUCTS LIMITED Wood street Willenhall West Midlands, WV13 1LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aston, Walter John 83 Longfellow Road The Straits Sedgley Dudley West Midlands / GB | 02 /
Garbett, Paul 12 Wistwood Hayes Moseley Parklands Wolverhampton WV10 8UG / GB | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Prutton, Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Prutton, Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304563.5 | 20.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | GB19870012258 | 23.05.1987 Original published format: GB 8712258 | GB19870018731 | 07.08.1987 Original published format: GB 8718731 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293137 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293137 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293137 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00, E05B47/06 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
E05B47/063 (EP,US);
E05B49/002 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0007 (EP,US);
E05B47/0004 (EP,US);
E05B47/0011 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7062 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7881 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/48] | E05B49/00 | Designated contracting states | GB [1993/20] |
Former [1988/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Elektronisches schlüsselbetätigbares Schloss und Schlüssel dafür | [1988/48] | English: | Electronic key-operable lock and key therefor | [1988/48] | French: | Serrure électronique susceptible d'être manoeuvrée par clé et clé pour cela | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 23.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2055951 (DAY H V); | [X]US4303909 (MARTIN FRANKLIN J); | [A]GB2024922 (MARLOK INC) |