EP0293185 - Semiconductor laser device and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morinaga, Motoyasu c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Furuyama, Hideto c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Masaru c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Nobuo c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 05 /
Hirayama, Yuzo c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 06 /
Okuda, Hajime c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304737.5 | 25.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | JP19870126944 | 26.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12694487 | JP19870204223 | 19.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20422387 | JP19870240845 | 28.09.1987 Original published format: JP 24084587 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293185 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293185 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293185 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/19, H01L27/15, H01L33/00 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
H01S5/026 (US);
H01S5/0261 (EP,US);
H01S5/0422 (US);
H01S5/04257 (EP,US);
H01S5/227 (EP,US);
H01S5/0208 (EP,US);
H01S5/04256 (EP,US);
H01S5/2275 (EP,US);
H01S5/2277 (EP,US);
H01S5/32391 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/48] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaservorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1988/48] | English: | Semiconductor laser device and method for manufacturing the same | [1988/48] | French: | Dispositif laser à semi-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 27.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61210689 ; | [A]EP0208209 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4366567 (FUKUZAWA TADASHI, et al); | [A]US4468850 (LIAU ZONG-LONG [US], et al); | [E]DE3713133 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol. OE-22, no. 6, June 1986, pages 805-821, IEEE, New York, US; O. WADA et al.: "Recent progress in optoelectronic integrated circuits (OEIC's)" | [A] - ELECTRONIC LETTERS, vol. 20, no. 21, 11th October 1984, pages 856-857, Staines, Middlesex, GB; T.L. KOCH et al.: "Low-threshold high-speed 1.55 mum vapour phase transported buried heterostructure lasers (VPTBH)" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 46 (E-479)[2493], 12th February 1987; & JP-A-61 210 689 (FUJITSU LTD) 18-09-1986, & JP61210689 A 00000000 |