EP0293203 - Freeze resistant pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZOJIRUSHI VACUUM BOTTLE CO., LTD. 20-5 Tenma 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states ZOJIRUSHI VACUUM BOTTLE CO., LTD. 20-5 Tenma 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takenakashima, Takefumi 7-9 Uematsu-cho 3-chome Yao-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Nishimura, Kazuo 9-3 Nagamo-dai 8-chome Kamo-cho Souraku-gun Kyoto-fu / JP | 03 /
Fujiyama, Mamoru 1-51-104 Tsurumaihigashi-machi Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Fukushima, Toshihiro 7-4 Nagamo-dai 3-chome Kamo-cho Souraku-gun Kyoto-ku / JP | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Gura, Henry Alan, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [1988/48] | Application number, filing date | 88304790.4 | 26.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | JP19870080178U | 27.05.1987 Original published format: JP 8017887 U | JP19870122978U | 11.08.1987 Original published format: JP 12297887 U | JP19870126595U | 19.08.1987 Original published format: JP 12659587 U | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293203 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293203 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/06 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
E03B7/10 (KR);
E03B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
F16L59/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Frostsicheres Rohr | [1988/48] | English: | Freeze resistant pipe | [1988/48] | French: | Tuyau insensible au gel | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 27.04.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8603819 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [X]BE852302 (POULL HENRI RAYMOND); | [A]DE1551570 (CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON CO); | [A]FR1413954 (AIR LIQUIDE); | [A]AT114638B (DOCZEKAL RUDOLF DR ING); | [A]DE1775073 (BP BENZIN UND PETROLEUM AG); | [A]DE3419496 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) |