EP0293230 - Acidic gas sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOTRONICS LIMITED Parsonage Road Takeley Bishop's Stortford Hertfordshire CM22 6PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states NEOTRONICS LIMITED Parsonage Road Takeley Bishop's Stortford Hertfordshire CM22 6PU / GB | ||
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states NEOTRONICS TECHNOLOGY PLC Parsonage Road Takeley Bishop's Stortford Hertfordshire, CM22 6PU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pletcher, Derek 16 Queens Close Romsey Hampshire, S051 8EG / GB | 02 /
Evans, John 3 St. Blaize Road Romsey Hampshire / GB | 03 /
Warburton, Piers Richard Grove The Rectory St.Andrews Guernsey Channel Islands / GB | 04 /
Gibbs, Trevor Kim 23 Vauxham Close Rayne Essex, CM7 8TW / GB | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304839.9 | 27.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | GB19870012582 | 28.05.1987 Original published format: GB 8712582 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293230 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293230 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293230 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/42, G01N27/416, G01N33/00, G01N21/78 | [1993/33] | CPC: |
G01N27/4045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/44] | G01N27/56, G01N27/46, G01N33/00, G01N21/78 | ||
Former IPC [1988/48] | G01N27/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Sensoren für saure Gase | [1988/48] | English: | Acidic gas sensors | [1988/48] | French: | Capteurs de gaz acides | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 20.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58079141 ; | [A]DE1076403 ; | [AD]US3795589 (DAHMS H); | [A]DD226655 (UNIV ROSTOCK [DD]) | [T] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 61, no. 6, March 1989, pages 577-580, Washington, D.C., US; J.EVANS et al.: "Amperometric Sensor for Carbon Dioxide: Design, Characteristics, and Performance" | [X] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 59, no. 4, February 1987, pages 666-670, Washington, D.C. US; A. RIOS et al.: Electrochemical Determination of Sulfur Dioxide in Air Samples in a Closed-Loop Flow Injection System" | [YD] - NATURE, vol. 218, 2oth April 1968, page 266, London GB; J. BERGMAN: "Metallized Membrane Electrode: Atmospheric Oxygen Monitoring and other Applications" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 176 (P-214)(1321), 4th August 1983; & JP-A-58 079 141 (HOOCHIKI) 12-05-1983, & JP58079141 A 00000000 |