EP0294981 - Method of producing grain-oriented silicon steel with small boron additions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLEGHENY LUDLUM CORPORATION 1000 Six PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states ALLEGHENY LUDLUM CORPORATION 1000 Six PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stroble, Carl Philip 1123 Carlisle Street Natrona Heights Pennsylvania 15065 / US | 02 /
More, Anthony Philip 122 Rivermont Court Cheswick Pennsylvania 15024 / US | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Sheader, Brian Norman, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | Sheader, Brian N., et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304915.7 | 31.05.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | US19870058078 | 04.06.1987 Original published format: US 58078 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0294981 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294981 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/02, C21D8/12 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
C21D8/1283 (EP,US);
C21D8/12 (KR);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C21D8/1222 (EP,US);
C21D8/1233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von kornorientiertem Silicium-Stahlblech mit geringen Borzusätzen | [1988/50] | English: | Method of producing grain-oriented silicon steel with small boron additions | [1988/50] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de toles d'acier au silicium à grains orientés avec petites additions de bore | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2348277 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [Y]GB1521731 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]FR2219980 (ARMCO STEEL CORP [US]); | [A]US4054471 (DATTA AMITAVA); | [A]US3676227 (MATSUMOTO FUMIO, et al) |