EP0294138 - Composite material centrifuge rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. Executive Office 2500 Harbor Boulevard Box 3100 Fullerton California 92634 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. Executive Office 2500 Harbor Boulevard Box 3100 Fullerton California 92634 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piramoon, Alirez M. 3836 Shasta Drive Santa Clara California 95051 / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric, et al Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Ede, Eric, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1988/49] | Fitzpatrick, Hugh Ivor Brunton Fitzpatricks 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304922.3 | 31.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | US19870058435 | 05.06.1987 Original published format: US 58435 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0294138 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0294138 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294138 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B04B7/08, B04B5/00 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
B04B7/085 (EP,US);
B29C53/66 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/49] | B04B7/08 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Verbundwerkstoff-Zentrifugenrotor | [1988/49] | English: | Composite material centrifuge rotor | [1988/49] | French: | Rotor centrifuge en matière composite | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 22.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 20.10.1993 | LI | 20.10.1993 | SE | 20.10.1993 | [1994/27] |
Former [1994/18] | CH | 20.10.1993 | |
LI | 20.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | DD102311 [ ]; | US3913828 [ ] (ROY PAUL A); | US3997106 [ ] (BARAM MARTIN); | DE3215138 [ ] (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]); | DE3116520 [ ] (HERAEUS CHRIST GMBH [DE]) |