EP0294154 - Single channel encode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ta, Chuong C. 9152 Danby Court San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 02 /
Majette, Mark W. 2330 29th Street San Diego, CA 92104 / US | 03 /
Mostafa, Hatem E. 10653 Ponder Way San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88304950.4 | 31.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | US19870056936 | 01.06.1987 Original published format: US 56936 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0294154 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0294154 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/34, G01D5/26, G01D5/24 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
G01D5/2457 (EP,US);
G01D5/36 (KR);
G01D15/24 (EP,US);
G01D5/245 (KR);
G01D5/34715 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/49] | G01D5/245, G01D5/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/49] | Title | German: | Einkanalcodiereinrichtung | [1988/49] | English: | Single channel encode | [1988/49] | French: | Encodeur monovoie | [1988/49] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/52] | Request for further processing for: | 13.04.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58009007 ; | [A]JP58032116 ; | [Y]US3815125 (MAY P, et al); | [Y]US4477726 (REICHI ALFRED [DE]); | [Y]US3533703 (WINGATE SIDNEY A); | [A]US3187187 (WINGATE SIDNEY A); | [A]US4564294 (ERNST ALFONS [DE]); | [A]US4359636 (STAUFFER NORMAN L); | [A]US4587418 (SHIRAKOSHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 78 (P-188)[1223], 31st March 1983; & JP-A-58 009 007 (NIHON KOUGAKU) 19-01-1983, & JP58009007 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 109 (P-196)[1254], 12th May 1983; & JP-A-58 032 116 (MATSUSHITA) 25-02-1983, & JP58032116 A 00000000 |