EP0294178 - Fabric for protective garments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marshall Jr., Ben Hagan 26 Muirfield Green Midlothian Virginia 23112 / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305005.6 | 01.06.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | US19870057441 | 02.06.1987 Original published format: US 57441 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0294178 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0294178 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294178 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, A41D31/00 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
A62B17/00 (KR);
A62B17/006 (EP,US);
A62D5/00 (EP);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B2323/046 (US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Gewebe für Schutzkleidung | [1988/49] | English: | Fabric for protective garments | [1988/49] | French: | Tissu pour vêtements protecteurs | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/08] | 27.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0202996 (CHEM FAB CORP [US]) |