EP0295050 - Process for preparing a 4,4-diphenylbutanoic acid derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quallich, George Joseph 349 Norwich Westerly Road North Stonington Connecticut / US | 02 /
Williams, Michael Trevelyan 133 London Road Deal Kent / GB | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305179.9 | 07.06.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | US19870060577 | 11.06.1987 Original published format: US 60577 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295050 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295050 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C57/58, C07C51/00, C07C49/697, C07C45/00, C07C59/56, C07D307/32 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
C07D307/33 (EP,US);
C07C61/15 (KR);
C07C45/46 (EP,US);
C07C45/59 (EP,US);
C07C49/697 (EP,US);
C07C51/09 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/46, C07C49/697 (EP,US);
C07C45/59, C07C49/697 (US,EP);
C07C51/09, C07C57/58 (US,EP);
C07C51/367, C07C59/56 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines 4,4-Diphenylbutansäurederivats | [1991/16] | English: | Process for preparing a 4,4-diphenylbutanoic acid derivative | [1988/50] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un dérivé de l'acide 4,4-diphényl-butanoique | [1988/50] |
Former [1988/50] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines 4,4-Diphenylbutansäurederivates | Examination procedure | 20.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/50] | 08.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3412146 [ ] (KOFRON WILLIAM G); | DE2112715 [ ] (THOMAE GMBH DR K); | EP0028901 [ ] (PFIZER [US]) |