Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0295077
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
11.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
18.06.1994 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] |
05.05.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] |
22.03.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] |
02.03.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] |
16.12.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] |
02.07.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] |
29.09.1992 |
First examination report |
|
26.04.1991 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] |
21.11.1990 |
Publication of search report |
published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] |
29.10.1988 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.12.1988 [1988/50] |