blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0295077

EP0295077 - Composition comprising polymer of 4-Methyl-Pentene-1 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.1994
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1988/50]For all designated states
MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sigemoto, Hiromi
4-5-39, Muronoki-cho
Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi / JP
[1988/50]
Representative(s)Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al
J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
[1988/50]
Application number, filing date88305223.508.06.1988
[1988/50]
Priority number, dateJP1987014650811.06.1987         Original published format: JP 14650887
[1988/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0295077
Date:14.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0295077
Date:09.01.1991
Language:EN
[1991/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0295077
Date:18.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.1990
ClassificationIPC:C08L23/20, C08K3/30, // (C08L23/20, C08K3:30)
[1988/50]
CPC:
C08K3/30 (EP,KR)
C-Set:
C08K3/30, C08L23/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/50]
TitleGerman:4-Methyl-penten-1 Polymer-Zusammensetzung[1988/50]
English:Composition comprising polymer of 4-Methyl-Pentene-1[1988/50]
French:Composition à base d'un polymère de 4-méthyl-pentène-1[1988/50]
Examination procedure17.04.1991Examination requested  [1991/24]
30.09.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.01.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.1993Fee for grant paid
21.04.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
09.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.08.1993
BE18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
ES18.08.1993
GR18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
NL18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
[2002/24]
Former [2000/04]AT18.08.1993
BE18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
GR18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
NL18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/25]AT18.08.1993
BE18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
NL18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/19]AT18.08.1993
CH18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/16]CH18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
SE18.08.1993
Former [1994/05]CH18.08.1993
LI18.08.1993
Documents cited:Search[X]US3462389  (SCHULDE FELIX, et al);
 [X]AT319586B  (CHEMIE LINZ AG)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.