EP0295087 - Apparatus for compatibly locking horizontal sync signal to PAL colour subcarrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/50] | Method and apparatus for compatibly locking horizontal sync signal to PAL subscriber | ||
[1996/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dischert, Lee Robert R.D. 1 Box 2006 Medford New Jersey 08055 / US | 02 /
Topper, Robert Joseph 131 Crooked Billet Road Hatboro Pennsylvania 19040 / US | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305245.8 | 08.06.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | US19870060097 | 09.06.1987 Original published format: US 60097 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295087 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295087 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295087 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/44 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
H04N9/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur kompatiblen Verriegelung des horizontalen Synchronimpulses mit dem PAL-Farbhilfsträger | [1996/16] | English: | Apparatus for compatibly locking horizontal sync signal to PAL colour subcarrier | [1996/16] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage compatible du signal de synchronisation horizontal sur la sous-porteuse couleur PAL | [1996/16] |
Former [1988/50] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kompatiblen Verriegelung des horizontalen Synchronimpulses mit dem PAL-Hilfsträger | ||
Former [1988/50] | Method and apparatus for compatibly locking horizontal sync signal to PAL subscriber | ||
Former [1988/50] | Méthode et dispositif de verrouillage compatible du signal de synchronisation horizontal sur la sous-porteuse PAL | Examination procedure | 29.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 24.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4450474 (MIZUKAMI MINEO [JP]) |