EP0310215 - System and method for completing multiple wells from a single well bore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1989 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.07.1989 [1989/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY 515 South Flower Street, P.O. Box 2679 Los Angeles California 90071 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY 515 South Flower Street Los Angeles California 90071 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Frank H. 5805 Wavertree Lane Plano, Texas 75075 / US | 02 /
Dech, James A. 2444 Majestic Drive Plano, Texas 75074 / US | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Coleman, Stanley, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | [1989/14] | Application number, filing date | 88305265.6 | 09.06.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | US19870101515 | 28.09.1987 Original published format: US 101515 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0310215 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/30 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
E21B23/00 (EP,US);
E21B41/0035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1989/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren, um eine Vielzahl von Bohrungen von einem einzelnen Bohrloch ausgehend auszurüsten | [1989/14] | English: | System and method for completing multiple wells from a single well bore | [1989/14] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour équiper plusieurs puits à partir d'un seul forage | [1989/14] | File destroyed: | 10.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4396075 (WOOD EDWARD T [US], et al); | [A]US4396230 (WOOD EDWARD T [US], et al); | [A]US4402551 (WOOD EDWARD T [US], et al); | [A]US4415205 (REHM WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [A]US4573541 (JOSSE JEAN-JACQUES [FR], et al) |