EP0295957 - Dynamic mechanical bonding method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ball, Walter Kenneth 6574 Thunderhill Lane Cincinnati Ohio 45233 / US | 02 /
Zorb, James Edward 2857 Colerain Avenue Cincinnati Ohio 45225 / US | 03 /
Goulait, David Joseph Kenneth 10025 Sonya Lane Cincinnati Ohio 45241 / US | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305577.4 | 17.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | US19870064896 | 19.06.1987 Original published format: US 64896 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295957 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295957 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/20, B32B31/20 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
B29C66/45 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,KR,US);
A44B18/0011 (EP,US);
A61F13/62 (EP,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/81433 (EP,US);
B29C66/8242 (EP,US);
B29C66/83411 (EP,US);
B29C66/83511 (EP,US);
B29C66/9241 (EP,US);
B29C66/929 (EP,US);
B29C66/93411 (EP,US);
B29C66/93451 (EP,US);
B29C66/939 (EP,US);
B29C66/344 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/729 (EP,US);
B29L2024/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/4878 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1737 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/51] | C08J5/12, B29C65/20, B32B31/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum dynamischen, mechanischen Verbinden und Vorrichtung dazu | [1988/51] | English: | Dynamic mechanical bonding method and apparatus | [1988/51] | French: | Procédé d'assemblage mécanique dynamique et appareil pour celui-ci | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 23.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91112103.6 / EP0456281 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3530023 [ ] (SCHUTTE RICHARD W, et al); | US3854031 [ ] (KELLER J); | US4035219 [ ] (CUMBERS DAVID CHARLES); | US4430148 [ ] (SCHAEFER JEAN E [US]) |