EP0300616 - Wall thickness measurement apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/04] | Wall thickness detector | ||
[1992/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emhart Glass Machinery Investments Inc. c/o RL&F Service Corp. One Rodney Square, 10th Floor 10th and King Streets Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states Emhart Glass Machinery Investments Inc. c/o RL&F Service Corp. One Rodney Square, 10th Floor 10th and King Streets Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states EMHART GLASS MACHINERY INC. The Corporation Trust Company, Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC. 701, East Joppa Road Towson, Maryland 21204 / US | ||
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC. 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, Paul F. 19 Capitol Avenue Hartford Connecticut 06106 / US | 02 /
Button, Donald C. P.O. Box 536 Cheshire Connecticut 06410 / US | 03 /
Reeves, Charles B. 2 Briggs Street Salem Massachusetts 01970 / US | 04 /
Howerter, Edward D. 11 Neal Road Danvers Massachusetts 01923 / US | [1992/40] |
Former [1989/04] | 01 /
Scott, Paul F. 19 Capitol Avenue Hartford Connecticut 06106 / US | ||
02 /
Button, Donald C. P.O. Bo 536 Cheshire Connecticut 06410 / US | |||
03 /
Reeves, Charles B. 2 Briggs Street Salem Massachusetts 01970 / US | |||
04 /
Howerter, Edward D. 11 Neal Road Danvers Massachusetts 01923 / US | Representative(s) | Wetters, Basil David Peter, et al Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | [1991/49] |
Former [1991/42] | Randall, John Walter Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | ||
Former [1989/20] | Randall, John Walter Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | ||
Former [1989/04] | Drury, Peter Lawrence Emhart Patents Department Lyn House 39 The Parade Oadby, Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305578.2 | 17.06.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | US19870069457 | 02.07.1987 Original published format: US 69457 | [1989/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0300616 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300616 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/08 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
G01B7/08 (EP,US);
B07C5/128 (EP,US);
B07C5/3408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/04] | Title | German: | Wanddicken-Messgerät | [1992/40] | English: | Wall thickness measurement apparatus | [1992/40] | French: | Appareil de mesure d epaisseur d une paroi | [1992/40] |
Former [1989/04] | Wanddicken-Detektor | ||
Former [1989/04] | Wall thickness detector | ||
Former [1989/04] | Détecteur d'épaisseur d'une paroi | Examination procedure | 17.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 24.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 17.06.1993 | [1994/41] | Documents cited: | Search | US3684089 [ ] (MCMEEKIN JAMES H); | DE1040263 [ ] (RAGNAR VEIMO); | FR2365785 [ ] (POPENOE CHARLES [US]) |