EP0300619 - Transferring device for conveyors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBOLIFT LIMITED Sterling House 165/175 Farnham Road Slough Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states ROBOLIFT LIMITED Sterling House 165/175 Farnham Road Slough Berkshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cunningham-Oakes, Barry John 1, Brett Close Kingsey Meadow Thame Oxon, OX9 3LE / GB | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [1989/04] | Quest, Barry, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw & Co., 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305610.3 | 20.06.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | GB19870014496 | 20.06.1987 Original published format: GB 8714496 | GB19880011011 | 10.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8811011 | [1989/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300619 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300619 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/84, B65G1/12, B65G47/57 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
B65G47/57 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/04] | B65G1/12, B65G47/57 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Übergabeeinrichtung für Förderer | [1989/04] | English: | Transferring device for conveyors | [1989/04] | French: | Dispositif de transfert pour un convoyeur | [1989/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB | 24.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 03.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/20] | 16.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.07.1988 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2219139 ; | [A]DE2522559 ; | [A]US3970217 |