EP0303345 - Methods and apparatus for fibre preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.1991 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haigh-Chadwick Limited Marsh Mills Cleckheaton West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states Haigh-Chadwick Limited Marsh Mills Cleckheaton West Yorkshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brydon, Alan 4 Cotswold Drive Liversedge West Yorkshire / GB | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | McNeight, David Leslie, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | McNeight, David Leslie, et al McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane Stockport Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305912.3 | 29.06.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | GB19870019093 | 12.08.1987 Original published format: GB 8719093 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303345 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303345 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D01G29/00, D01G23/04 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
D01G29/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/07] | D01G29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Faserpräparation | [1989/07] | English: | Methods and apparatus for fibre preparation | [1989/07] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'ensimage des fibres | [1989/07] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/08] | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.07.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.07.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0173160 ; | [Y]GB2067608 ; | [A]US4019225 ; | [A]DE1139412 |