EP0299663 - Antihistaminic aromatic tetrahydroazepinones (and thiones) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.H. ROBINS COMPANY, INCORPORATED (a Delaware corporation) 1407 Cummings Drive P.O. Box 26609 Richmond Virginia 23261-6609 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states A.H. ROBINS COMPANY, INCORPORATED (a Delaware corporation) 1407 Cummings Drive P.O. Box 26609 Richmond Virginia 23261-6609 / US | ||
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states A.H. ROBINS COMPANY, INCORPORATED 1407 Cummings Drive P.O. Box 26609 Richmond Virginia 23261-6609 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cale, Albert Duncan, Jr. Route 8 Box 150 Mechanicsville Virginia / US | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Connelly, Michael John, et al John Wyeth & Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Connelly, Michael John, et al John Wyeth & Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB | ||
Former [1989/03] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306109.5 | 05.07.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | US19870072649 | 13.07.1987 Original published format: US 72649 | [1989/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0299663 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0299663 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D223/16, C07D403/06, A61K31/55, C07D401/06, // (C07D471/04, 223:00, 221:00) | [1989/03] | CPC: |
C07D223/16 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D417/00 (KR);
C07D487/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/03] | Title | German: | Antihistaminische aromatische Tetrahydroazepinone (und -thione) | [1989/03] | English: | Antihistaminic aromatic tetrahydroazepinones (and thiones) | [1989/03] | French: | Tétrahydroazépinones (et thiones) aromatiques antihistaminiques | [1989/03] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/32] | 14.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.01.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0107930 (ROBINS CO INC A H [US]); | [A]GB778808 (CIBA LTD); | [A]US3686165 (LOEV BERNARD); | [A]DE1909741 (ROBINS CO INC A H) |