EP0301715 - Display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THORN EMI PLC 4 Tenterden Street London W1A 2AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | For all designated states THORN EMI plc 4 Tenterden Street London W1A 2AY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Graham Leslie 38, Greenacres Avenue Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex, UB10 8HQ / US | [1989/05] | Representative(s) | Hurst, Richard Arthur Alexander, et al THORN EMI Patents Limited, Central Research Laboratories, Dawley Road Hayes Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Hurst, Richard Arthur Alexander, et al THORN EMI Patents Limited, Central Research Laboratories, Dawley Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB | ||
Former [1989/05] | Fleming, Ian Alexander THORN EMI Patents Limited The Quadrangle Westmount Centre Uxbridge Road Hayes Middlesex, UB4 0HB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306147.5 | 06.07.1988 | [1989/05] | Priority number, date | GB19870018046 | 30.07.1987 Original published format: GB 8718046 | [1989/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0301715 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0301715 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/12, H04N3/12, H04N9/30, G02F1/133 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
G02F1/133621 (EP);
G09G3/3406 (EP);
H04N9/12 (EP);
G02F1/133622 (EP);
G09G2310/0235 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/05] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [1989/05] | English: | Display device | [1989/05] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage | [1989/05] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 03.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.08.1989 | M01   Fee paid on   10.08.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.1992 | CH | 09.12.1992 | GR | 09.12.1992 | LI | 09.12.1992 | LU | 31.07.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/25] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
CH | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | CH | 09.12.1992 | |
LI | 09.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3569614 (HANLON THOMAS F); | [AD]GB1433327 (AXBEY P J); | [Y]WO8202634 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [Y]WO8202635 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [YD]GB2172733 (LOHJA AB OY) | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | JPS62106437 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN volume 11, no. 319 (P-627) (2766), 17th October 1987 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN volume 6, no. 18 (P-100) (896), 2nd February 1982 |