EP0298757 - Method for preparing vitamin D compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omura, Sadafumi 523-7, Haraichi Ageo-shi / JP | 02 /
Mikami, Akiko 4-21, Nakacho-2-chome Urawa-shi / JP | 03 /
Sasaki, Joji Kotobukiso 102 57-2, Higashiomiya-4-chome Omiya-shi / JP | 04 /
Mizoue, Kazutoshi Dai-5-Royaru Kopo 107 8-21, Buzo-1-chome Urawa-shi / JP | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1989/02] | Coleiro, Raymond MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306245.7 | 08.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | JP19870170669 | 08.07.1987 Original published format: JP 17066987 | JP19870331323 | 26.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33132387 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298757 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298757 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/02, C07C401/00 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
C07C401/00 (EP,US);
C12P7/02 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S435/826 (EP,US);
Y10S435/872 (EP,US);
Y10S435/886 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/02] | C12P7/02, C07C172/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Vitamin-D-Derivaten | [1989/02] | English: | Method for preparing vitamin D compounds | [1989/02] | French: | Méthode de préparation de dérivés de vitame D | [1989/02] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 13.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 11.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4502991 (DELUCA HECTOR F [US], et al) |