EP0298762 - Cap liner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1996 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] | 06.09.1996 | Change - representative | published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Hak-Rhim c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al 3M United Kingdom PLC 3M Centre Cain Road Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Boulevard de la Woluwe 106 B-1200 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1989/02] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88306262.2 | 08.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | US19870072136 | 10.07.1987 Original published format: US 72136 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0298762 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0298762 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298762 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/14, B65D53/04 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
B65D53/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24165 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24174 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/02] | Title | German: | Verschlusskappe mit Packung | [1989/02] | English: | Cap liner | [1989/02] | French: | Capsule avec joint d'étanchéité | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.1994
04.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE Opponent's representative Engisch, Gautier NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.1994
04.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE Opponent's representative Engisch, Gautier Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 22.07.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.11.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 29.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.03.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/43] | 30.05.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3786954 (SHULL R); | [A]US3928109 (POLLOCK WILLIAM J, et al); | [X]GB1596472 (SELIG SEALING PRODUCTS INC); | [X]US4457440 (DUKESS JOSEPH [US]) |