EP0299712 - Catalyst for olefin polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, 2-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, 2-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuura, Mitsuyuki, c/o Mitsubishi Petrochem.Co. Jushi Kenkyusho, 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-Shi, Mie-Ken / JP | 02 /
Fujita, Takashi, c/o Mitsubishi Petrochem.Co. Jushi Kenkyusho, 1,Toho-cho Yokkaichi-Shi, Mie-Ken / JP | [1994/15] |
Former [1989/03] | 01 /
Matsuura, Mitsuyuki Mitsubishi Petrochem. Co. Ltd Jushi Kenkyusho, 1 Toho-Cho Yokkaichi-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | ||
02 /
Fujita, Takashi Mitsubishi Petrochem. Co. Ltd Jushi Kenkyusho, 1 Toho-Cho Yokkaichi-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | Representative(s) | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306346.3 | 12.07.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | JP19870174260 | 13.07.1987 Original published format: JP 17426087 | JP19870182720 | 22.07.1987 Original published format: JP 18272087 | [1989/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0299712 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0299712 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299712 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/64, C08F10/00 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6567 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/03] | Title | German: | Katalysator für Olefinpolymerisation | [1989/03] | English: | Catalyst for olefin polymerization | [1989/03] | French: | Catalyseur pour polymérisation d'oléfines | [1989/03] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 20.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP90202391.0 / EP0410548 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP53080382 ; | [Y]EP0086288 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [Y]EP0171606 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 18, October 1978, page 13, abstract no. 147402d, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-53 080 382 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD) 15-07-1978, & JP53080382 A 00000000 |