Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
23.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] |
30.12.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.02.1993 [1993/07] |
10.04.1992 | First examination report | |
22.11.1990 | Change - applicant | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] |
08.06.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.07.1990 [1990/30] |
12.12.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 31.01.1990 [1990/05] |
25.02.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.04.1989 [1989/15] |