EP0311236 - LCD compensation for non-optimum voltage conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garner, Grant K. 2960 NE Lancaster Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88306591.4 | 19.07.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | US19870107061 | 09.10.1987 Original published format: US 107061 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311236 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311236 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311236 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G05F1/625, H02M7/44 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
G02F1/133 (KR);
G05F1/625 (EP,US);
G09G3/18 (EP,US);
G09G3/36 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/15] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige mit Kompensation nicht optimaler Spannungsverhältnisse | [1989/15] | English: | LCD compensation for non-optimum voltage conditions | [1989/15] | French: | Affichage à cristaux liquides avec circuit de compensation pour les conditions de tension non optimales | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2097971 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [A]EP0224869 (HOSIDEN ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no 28 (E-1)(510), 8 March 1980 |