blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0306141

EP0306141 - Rotary drives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.04.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.1993 [1993/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAGUAR CARS LIMITED
Browns Lane Allesley Coventry CV5 9DR
West Midlands / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/10]For all designated states
JAGUAR CARS LIMITED
Browns Lane
Allesley Coventry CV5 9DR West Midlands / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Parsons, Bryan Nigel Victor
2 Church Street
Stoney Stanton Leicestershire / GB
[1989/10]
Representative(s)Cundy, Anthony Brian, et al
Anthony Cundy & Co., 1623 Warwick Road Knowle, Solihull
West Midlands B93 9LF / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/10]Cundy, Anthony Brian, et al
Anthony Cundy & Co., 1623 Warwick Road
Knowle, Solihull, West Midlands B93 9LF / GB
Application number, filing date88306849.626.07.1988
[1989/10]
Priority number, dateGB1987002049429.08.1987         Original published format: GB 8720494
[1989/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0306141
Date:08.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0306141
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1990
ClassificationIPC:F16H21/10, F01L7/00
[1990/25]
CPC:
F01L7/06 (EP,US); F16H21/12 (EP,US); F01L2313/00 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86405 (EP,US); Y10T74/184 (EP,US); Y10T74/19555 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1989/10]F16H21/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/10]
TitleGerman:Drehantrieb[1989/10]
English:Rotary drives[1989/10]
French:Entraînement rotatif[1989/10]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure27.06.1990Examination requested  [1990/34]
07.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.08.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/23]
11.01.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1993/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199205   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US1206067  (WELL HUGO C [US]);
 [A]US1068567  (COEN FREDERICK WILLIAM [US])
 [A]  - J. VOLMER "Getriebetechnik, Leitfaden", 1. Auflage, 1978, Vieweg, Braunschweig
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.